This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/22/2022 at 17:04:32 (UTC).

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC vs. ALVARADO, RAFAEL A

Case Summary

On 09/23/2022 LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ALVARADO, RAFAEL A. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 MF

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKEVIEW LOAN SERVICING LLC

Defendants

ALVARADO, RAFAEL A

PAGAN, EDITH M

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 1

UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION 2

GRAMERCY FAMRS MASTER ASSOCIATION INC

THE INDEPENDENT SAVINGS PLAN COMPANY D/B/A ISPC

KB HOME ORLANDO LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KASPER, KATHRYN I

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

9/23/2022: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

9/23/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

10/24/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022092892; Applied Amount: $985.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2022092892

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: LPOVER WAIVED $5.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: RECEIPT # 2022091845 MODIFIED: PAYMENT $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022091845; Applied Amount: $0.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $985.00 RECEIPT #2022091845

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM/CROSS-CLAIM/COUNTERCLAIM/COUNTERPERTTITION/ THIRD-PARTY COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/23/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002558 MF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less