This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 09/27/2021 at 15:12:33 (UTC).

LAKESHORE AT NARCOOSSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC vs. OKALI, PETER O

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 LAKESHORE AT NARCOOSSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against OKALI, PETER O. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 MF

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LAKESHORE AT NARCOOSSEE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Defendants

OKALI, PETER O

OKALI, OLACHI

ANY UNKNOWN PERSONS IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBNER, SARAH E

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

9/24/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/14/2021: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $435.00 RECEIPT #2021081841

9/14/2021: PAYMENT $435.00 RECEIPT #2021081841

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

9/13/2021: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

PROPOSED STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

9/13/2021: PROPOSED STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/13/2021: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

9/13/2021: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/13/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/13/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/13/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/13/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021081841; Applied Amount: $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $435.00 RECEIPT #2021081841

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/13/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002475 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer WEBNER SARAH E