This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 12/17/2022 at 14:54:11 (UTC).

KITCHEN, BARBARA vs. OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 09/28/2016 KITCHEN, BARBARA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 CI

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KITCHEN, BARBARA

Defendant

OMEGA INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TREUSCH, ANDY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/28/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

9/28/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9/28/2016: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCE

9/28/2016: REQUEST FOR PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

9/28/2016: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/28/2016: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

9/28/2016: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2016105962

9/29/2016: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2016105962

NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

10/28/2016: NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND NOTICE OF PROVIDING EMAIL ADDRESS 'PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

11/17/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND NOTICE OF PROVIDING EMAIL ADDRESS 'PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

NOTICE OF ATTORNEY FEE AND COST LIEN

11/22/2016: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY FEE AND COST LIEN

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

2/15/2017: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (DUPLICATE ORIGINAL E-FILED)

3/6/2017: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (DUPLICATE ORIGINAL E-FILED)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (REC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (DUPLICATE ORIGINAL E-FILED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY OF RECORD WITHIN FIRM DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AND DIRECTION TO CLERK TO UPDATE ATTORNEY INFORMATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2016
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ATTORNEY FEE AND COST LIEN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2016
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF AND NOTICE OF PROVIDING EMAIL ADDRESS 'PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESS DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2016
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2016105962

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2016
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/28/2016 CASE NUMBER 2016 CA 002490 CI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less