This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/22/2023 at 15:42:22 (UTC).

KING, BARBARA vs. CITY BEVERAGES LLC

Case Summary

On 09/01/2022 KING, BARBARA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against CITY BEVERAGES LLC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 ON

  • Filing Date:

    09/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KING, BARBARA

Defendants

CITY BEVERAGES LLC

FLORIDA BEVERAGE CORPORATION

REYES HOLDINGS LLC D/B/A/ REYES HOLDING II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COPANY, LLC, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LABOVICK, BRIAN F

BIE, KRISTIAN

Defendant Attorneys

LUNDY, S. RENEE STEPHENS

FULLER, SUSAN R

 

Court Documents

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, CITY BEVERAGES REQUEST TO PRODUCTION DATED OCTOBER 27, 2022

11/8/2022: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, CITY BEVERAGES REQUEST TO PRODUCTION DATED OCTOBER 27, 2022

DEFENDANT, CITY BEVERAGES LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

10/27/2022: DEFENDANT, CITY BEVERAGES LLC'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DEFENDANTS, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIOINS

10/26/2022: DEFENDANTS, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIOINS

PLAINTIFF, BARBARA KINGS, MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, D/B/A REYES HOLDINGS, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC TO FULLY AND COMPLETELY ANSWER PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES #8, #9 AND #12 AND TO PRODUCE ALL DOCUMENTS RES

10/24/2022: PLAINTIFF, BARBARA KINGS, MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, D/B/A REYES HOLDINGS, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC TO FULLY AND COMPLETELY ANSWER PLAINTIFFS INTERROGATORIES #8, #9 AND #12 AND TO PRODUCE ALL DOCUMENTS RESPONSIVE TO PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE #6 AND #7

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A REYES HOLDINGS, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATED OCTOBER 18, 2022

10/24/2022: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A REYES HOLDINGS, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION DATED OCTOBER 18, 2022

DEFENDANT'S REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

10/20/2022: DEFENDANT'S REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

DEFENDANT'S, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S TO INTERROGATORIES

10/20/2022: DEFENDANT'S, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC, REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF'S TO INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A REYES HOLDING, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES DATED OCTOBER 18, 2022

10/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A REYES HOLDING, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC'S MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES DATED OCTOBER 18, 2022

PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A REYES HOLDINGS, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC'S MEDICARE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DATED OCTOBER 18, 2022

10/19/2022: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS, LLC D/B/A REYES HOLDINGS, II, LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC'S MEDICARE REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS DATED OCTOBER 18, 2022

DEFENDANT REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF IN COMPLIANCE WITH MEDICARE SECONDARY PAYOR ACT

10/18/2022: DEFENDANT REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF IN COMPLIANCE WITH MEDICARE SECONDARY PAYOR ACT

DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS LLC REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC IMPROPERLY NAMED AS REYES HOLDINGS LLC DBA REYES HOLDINGS II LLC DBA FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

10/18/2022: DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS LLC REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC IMPROPERLY NAMED AS REYES HOLDINGS LLC DBA REYES HOLDINGS II LLC DBA FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS LLC REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC IMPROPERLY NAMED AS REYES HOLDINGS LLC DBA REYES HOLDINGS II LLC DBA FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

10/18/2022: DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS LLC REYES HOLDINGS II LLC AND FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC IMPROPERLY NAMED AS REYES HOLDINGS LLC DBA REYES HOLDINGS II LLC DBA FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY LLC REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

10/18/2022: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING MEDICARE INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

10/18/2022: NOTICE OF PROPOUNDING INITIAL INTERROGATORIES

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/6/2022 PARTY SERVED:FLORIDA BEVERAGE CORPORATION

10/12/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/6/2022 PARTY SERVED:FLORIDA BEVERAGE CORPORATION

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/7/2022 PARTY SERVED: CITY BEVERAGES LLC

10/12/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/7/2022 PARTY SERVED: CITY BEVERAGES LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/6/2022 PARTY SERVED: FLORIDA BEVERAGE CORPORATION

10/11/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/6/2022 PARTY SERVED: FLORIDA BEVERAGE CORPORATION

DEFENDANTS, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC,REYES HOLDINGS II LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC,ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

10/7/2022: DEFENDANTS, REYES HOLDINGS, LLC,REYES HOLDINGS II LLC D/B/A FLORIDA DISTRIBUTING COMPANY, LLC,ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S CERTIFICATE OF NON-OJBECTION AND REQUEST FOR FOR COPIES OF RECORDS RECEIVED PURSUANT TO DEFENDANT, CITY BEVERAGES, LLC'S NOTICE OF NON PARTY PRODUCTION DATED JANUARY 10, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TAPED DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM (DEPONENT WILL BE PRODUCED BU COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS LLC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA ZOOM (DEPONENT WILL BE PRODUCED BY COUNEL FOR DEFENDANT REYES HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TAPED DEPOSITIONS VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TAPED DEPOSITIONS VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO TAPED DEPOSITION VIA ZOOM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFEDNANT'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
51 More Docket Entries
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION (PURSUANT TO FLA. R. JUD. ADMIN. 2.516, EFFECTIVE SEPTEMBER 1, 2012)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT CITY BEVERAGES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT CITY BEVERAGES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, CITY BEVERAGES, LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/01/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002301 ON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less