This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/02/2022 at 22:06:12 (UTC).

J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP vs. JAMASON, WILLIAM JR

Case Summary

On 08/05/2022 J P MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against JAMASON, WILLIAM JR. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 MF

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

J.P. MORGAN MORTGAGE ACQUISITION CORP

Defendants

JAMASON, WILLIAM JR

JAMASON, BARBARA A

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM JAMASON JR

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA JMASON A

SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DELANEY, SUZANNE V.

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/5/2022: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

8/5/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/5/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA A JAMASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WILLIAM JAMASON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 8/25/2022 PARTY SERVED: SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 8/27/2022 PARTY SERVED: BARBARA A JAMASON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 8/27/2022 PARTY SERVED: WILLIAM JAMASON JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING - RETURN OF SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNKNOWN SPOUSES OF WILLIAM JAMASON AND BARBARA A JAMASON; UNKNOWN TENANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF PROMISSORY NOTE POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S VALUE FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/05/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002087 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SWEETWATER CREEK NEIGHBORHOOD ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where JP Morgan Mortgage Acquisition Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DELANEY, SUZANNE V.