This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/23/2022 at 15:06:23 (UTC).

JORGE L BERMUDEZ vs. ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP.

Case Summary

On 08/09/2022 JORGE L BERMUDEZ filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JORGE L BERMUDEZ

NELIDA BERMUDEZ

Defendant

ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOUIS, PIERRE ANDRE ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS 8/16/22 ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP. KATHLEEN SUNDBERG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022074283; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022074283

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/09/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002076 CI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ASI PREFERRED INSURANCE CORP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LOUIS , PIERRE A