This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:44:02 (UTC).

JONES, RACHEL E vs ICOLARI, PAUL E

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 JONES, RACHEL E filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against ICOLARI, PAUL E. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER, MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III and Z HALKER-SIMPSON, JANIS M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 OD

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RODRIGUEZ, HEATHER PINDER

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

Z HALKER-SIMPSON, JANIS M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

JONES, RACHEL E

Respondent

ICOLARI, PAUL E

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

LEBRON, MICHELE

LEBRON, MICHELE A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET-CASE AT ISSUE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: PATERNITY AGREEMENT AND PARENTING AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: PROMISSORY NOTE FOR MEDIATION SERVICES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATOR REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • HearingEvent: MEDIATION-FAMILY; Judge: Z HALKER-SIMPSON, JANIS M; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: IMPASSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $120.15 RECEIPT #2019093816

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT FOR MEDIATION FOR RACHEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF RESPONDENT ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER TO PICK UP MINOR CHILD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS FOR RACHEL (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: EMERGENCY VERIFIED MOTION FOR CHILD PICK-UP ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR DETERMINATION OF CIVIL INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES (ORIGINAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 DR 000007 OD

    Read MoreRead Less