This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 17:10:56 (UTC).

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC vs. UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Case Summary

On 04/02/2017 JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SP

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC

Defendants

USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY,

USAA GENERAL INDEMNITY COMPANY

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN, BRUCE H ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

8/7/2017: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

5/28/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

4/25/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

4/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

4/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

4/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

4/11/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

4/10/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

4/7/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017035509

4/6/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017035509

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/2/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/2/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$100.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4/2/2017: $100.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION INVOKING THE FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (AT PRE-TRIAL/ MEDIATION) / (5/23/17) ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017035509

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 05/19/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/03/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 001338 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $100.00 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less