This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 20:16:03 (UTC).

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC vs. AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SP

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC

Defendants

SOUTHERN-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

AUTO-OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AMORGINOS, SEAN M. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

SEXTON, JASON J

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

9/5/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION

3/29/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION

DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/13/2017: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM ALLEGATIONS IN COMPLAINT ADMITTED AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT DUE TO DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS

12/12/2017: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM ALLEGATIONS IN COMPLAINT ADMITTED AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT DUE TO DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

10/30/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/30/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

10/30/2017: NOTICE OF SERVING EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

8/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

8/25/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DEPOSITIONS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/17/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017062921

6/23/2017: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017062921

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

6/22/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

$ 762.36 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

6/21/2017: $ 762.36 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

6/21/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

6/21/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/06/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF CHANGE OF LAW FIRM INFORMATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS/RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF AND EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DEEM ALLEGATIONS IN COMPLAINT ADMITTED AND FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT DUE TO DEFENDANTS' FAILURE TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER AND OBJECTIONS/RESPONSES TO DEFENDANTS INTERROGATORIE TO PLAINTIFF'S AND EXPERT WITNESS INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketEntry: STIPULATION FOR ORDER TO WAIVE APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2017062921

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 08/04/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 762.36 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: LETTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/21/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 002516 SP

    Read MoreRead Less