This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 22:31:34 (UTC).

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC vs. ALLIED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 08/28/2017 JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ALLIED PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 SP

  • Filing Date:

    08/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JAGUAR GLASSWORKS PROS, LLC

Defendants

ALLIED PROPERTY & CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

VICTORIA SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY

TITAN INSURANCE COMPANY

NATIONWIDE INSURANCE COMPANY OF FLORIDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KAUFFMAN, BRUCE H ESQ

Defendant Attorney

RHODES, TREVOR T

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

6/3/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

4/8/2018: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

12/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/11/2017: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

10/13/2017: STIPULATION WAIVING APPEARANCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND INVOKING RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE

DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

10/11/2017: DEFENDANTS NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

9/14/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

8/29/2017: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

8/29/2017: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

11/13/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE

11/13/2017: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

10/11/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

8/29/2017: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017085261

8/29/2017: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017085261

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

8/28/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

8/25/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/25/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

8/25/2017: $ - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/05/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY AND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING VERIFIED ANSWERS TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVING ANSWERS TO PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $65.00 RECEIPT #2017085261

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 10/27/2017 AT 8:29 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/28/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 003514 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less