This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 09/14/2021 at 17:09:41 (UTC).

HERNANDEZ, JOSE vs. DEMONTERIO GALMORE, MICHAEL

Case Summary

On 07/16/2021 HERNANDEZ, JOSE filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against DEMONTERIO GALMORE, MICHAEL. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 AN

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

HERNANDEZ, JOSE

CALDERON, GUADALUPE

Defendants

DEMONTERIO GALMORE, MICHAEL

EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIEZ-ARGUELLES, CARLOS ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

8/31/2021: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

7/20/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

7/20/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

7/20/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FO ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

7/20/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FO ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

7/20/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

PROPOSED GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

7/20/2021: PROPOSED GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2021064432

7/19/2021: PAYMENT $430.00 RECEIPT #2021064432

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/16/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

7/16/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT,

7/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT,

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

7/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

7/16/2021: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

7/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

7/16/2021: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

7/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

7/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

7/16/2021: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM YIN ZHOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM YIN ZHOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO THE DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, EAN HOLDINGS, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, MICHAEL DEMONTERIO GALMORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where EAN Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Diez-Arguelles, Carlos R