This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 06/14/2021 at 17:05:46 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF: WRIGHT, SARAH V

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 GUARDIANSHIP OF WRIGHT, SARAH V was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 GR

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Petitioners

WRIGHT, FLORENCE F

WRIGHT, DAVID S

Not Yet Classified

WRIGHT, SARAH V

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DANI, LEE K

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ENVELOPE FROM WILL COUNTY COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: IMPOUNED AND SEALED DOCUMENT NOT TO BE OPEN BUT BY COURT ORDER-PHYSICIANS REPORT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR DISBALED PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR DISBAILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN FOR DISBALED PERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORIGINAL DOCUMENTS- NOT TO BE OPEN BUT BY COURT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE OF OFFICE OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON OF A DISABLED ADULT- FLORENCE WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE OF OFFICE OF GUARDIAN OF THE PERSON OF A DISABLED ADULT-DAVID WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE OF OFFICE OF GUARDIAN OF ESTATE OF DISABLED ADULT- FLORENCE F WRIGHT

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM ATTORNEY TO WILL COUNTY CLERK OF COURTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM CLERK OF COURT -WILL COUNTY ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED PETITION TO RECOGNIZE GUARDIANSHIP IN FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021035247; Applied Amount: $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021035247

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/15/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 GA 000053 GR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING PLENARY GUARDIAN FOR A DISABLED ADULT WILL COUNTY ILLINOIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED PETITION TO RECOGNIZE GUARDIANSHIP IN FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY E-MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DANI, LEE K