Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/21/2020 at 11:21:30 (UTC).

GUARDIANSHIP OF: M, Y S

Case Summary

On 06/25/2018 GUARDIANSHIP OF M, Y S was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 GR

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

MCCLAIN, YVONNE S

MCCLAIN, TAIWAN D

M, Y S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

TURMAN, DEAN K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2020068737

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketEntry: LETTER DATED AUGUST 28 2020 RECEIVED FROM LAW OFFICE OF DEAN TURMAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $85.00 RECEIPT #2020067839

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEYS FEES AND EXPENSES - RECORDED (OR.5782.1618. / 2020113726)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S NOTE TO FILE-ANNUAL ACCOUNTING VIA EMAIL TO AUDITOR/PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE VIA EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: UNSIGNED ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR ORDER AUTHORIZING PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND EXPENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: CONSENT TO PAYMENT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketEntry: ANNUAL ACCOUNTING OF GUARDIAN OF PROPERTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S NOTE TO FILE -EMAILED ORDER BELOW TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
38 More Docket Entries
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PROPERTY OF MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF PROPERTY OF MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2018063273

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED ORDER APPOINTING GUARDIAN OF PROPERTY OF MINOR W/JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED LETTERS OF GUARDIANSHIP OF THE PROPERTY OF MINOR W/JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR APPOINTMENT OF GUARDIAN OF MINOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: OATH OF GUARDIAN DESIGNATION OF RESIDENT AGENT AND ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: APPLICATION FOR APPOINTMENT AS GUARDIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/25/2018 CASE NUMBER 2018 GA 000096 GR

    Read MoreRead Less