This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/31/2020 at 12:45:47 (UTC).

FUGATE LAND HOLDINGS LLC vs. VAZQUEZ, YOLINETTE

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 FUGATE LAND HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against VAZQUEZ, YOLINETTE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FUGATE LAND HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

VAZQUEZ, YOLINETTE

NIEVES, XIOMAYRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HAYES, ROBERT S.

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/7/19

2/15/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/7/19

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY

2/4/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (RETURNED BACK FROM SHERRIF - WRONG ADDRESS)

1/25/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (RETURNED BACK FROM SHERRIF - WRONG ADDRESS)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION AFTER DEFAULT

1/16/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION AFTER DEFAULT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1/14/19

1/14/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1/14/19

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/5/19 PARTY SERVED: XIOMARA NIEVES (CO-RESIDENT)

1/11/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/5/19 PARTY SERVED: XIOMARA NIEVES (CO-RESIDENT)

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/5/19 PARTY SERVED: XIOMARA NIEVES

1/11/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/5/19 PARTY SERVED: XIOMARA NIEVES

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/3/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019000787

1/3/2019: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019000787

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/2/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/2/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/2/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/7/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • DocketEntry: CLERK NOTES; WRIT OF POSSESSION SENT BACK TO THE ATTY ALONG W/CK#13940 FOR $90 / WRONG ADDRESS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (RETURNED BACK FROM SHERRIF - WRONG ADDRESS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - AFTER DEFAULT - RECORDED (OR.5468.654. / 2019010789)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION AFTER DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) / DEFAULT ENTERED ON 1/14/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/5/19 PARTY SERVED: XIOMARA NIEVES (CO-RESIDENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/5/19 PARTY SERVED: XIOMARA NIEVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019000787

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/02/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000013 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HAYES, ROBERT S.