This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/10/2021 at 01:39:46 (UTC).

EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC, DBA ITEST ENVIRONMENTAL AND MOLDEXPERT.COM A/A/O LISSETTE SANTIAGO vs. SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 12/18/2019 EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC, DBA ITEST ENVIRONMENTAL AND MOLDEXPERT COM A/A/O LISSETTE SANTIAGO filed an Other lawsuit against SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 OT

  • Filing Date:

    12/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC, DBA ITEST ENVIRONMENTAL AND MOLDEXPERT.COM A/A/O LISSETTE SANTIAGO

Defendant

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOUIS, PIERRE ANDRE ESQ

Defendant Attorney

GLASGOW, GINA S ESQ

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PETITIONER

4/28/2020: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PETITIONER

DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PETITIONER

4/28/2020: DEFENDANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PETITIONER

SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSE, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN RESPONSE TO PETITION OF EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC D/B/A ITEST ENVIRONMENTAL AND MOLDEXPERT.COM A/A/O LISSETTE SANTIAGO

1/15/2020: SOUTHERN FIDELITY INSURANCE COMPANY'S RESPONSE, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL IN RESPONSE TO PETITION OF EXPERT INSPECTIONS, LLC D/B/A ITEST ENVIRONMENTAL AND MOLDEXPERT.COM A/A/O LISSETTE SANTIAGO

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

12/26/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

12/18/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PETITIONERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES

12/17/2019: PETITIONERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/17/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/17/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S INTERROGATORIES

2/14/2020: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S INTERROGATORIES

RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S INTERROGATORIES

2/7/2020: RESPONDENT'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF UNVERIFIED ANSWERS TO PETITIONER'S INTERROGATORIES

RESPONDENT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

2/7/2020: RESPONDENT'S PRIVILEGE LOG

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

1/29/2020: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

1/15/2020: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

1/15/2020: DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019123862

12/19/2019: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019123862

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/17/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

COMPLAINT

12/17/2019: COMPLAINT

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUBPOEBA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2020
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, OTHER SERVICE . DATE SERVED : 12/18/2020 PARTY SERVED: LARRY NEJAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF VERIFIED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S INTERROGTORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER'S AMENDED MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION DATES CERTAIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF TAKING TELEPHONIC DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES DESIGNATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 12/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2019123862

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/18/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 003990 OT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONERS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less