This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/05/2021 at 10:47:58 (UTC).

ELHARTI, ABDELAZIZ vs. PROUT, JACQUELINE

Case Summary

On 02/08/2019 ELHARTI, ABDELAZIZ filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PROUT, JACQUELINE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 EV

  • Filing Date:

    02/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELHARTI, ABDELAZIZ

Defendant

PROUT, JACQUELINE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

4/23/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

4/11/2019: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION (GRANTED)

4/11/2019: ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION (GRANTED)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

4/8/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

NOTICE OF HEARING

2/27/2019: NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

2/22/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/8/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT )

2/8/2019: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT )

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/8/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION(FTJ)

4/11/2019: MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION(FTJ)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY JUDGE

4/8/2019: ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY JUDGE

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY - RECORDED (OR.5505.122. / 2019044759)

4/8/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY - RECORDED (OR.5505.122. / 2019044759)

RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: JACQUELINE PROUT

3/11/2019: RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: JACQUELINE PROUT

ANSWER & MOTION FOR HEARING

2/20/2019: ANSWER & MOTION FOR HEARING

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019013479

2/8/2019: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019013479

SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLTY)

2/8/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLTY)

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/8/2019: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

2/8/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION (GRANTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION(FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY - RECORDED (OR.5505.122. / 2019044759)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO DETERMINE RENT; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: RETURNED MAIL ADDRESSED TO: JACQUELINE PROUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/12/19 PARTY SERVED: JACQUELINE PROUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER & MOTION FOR HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2019013479

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO PLTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/08/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000445 EV

    Read MoreRead Less