Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 16:24:14 (UTC).

DODDATO, JOHN vs. THOMAS, ROBIN

Case Summary

On 01/12/2017 DODDATO, JOHN filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against THOMAS, ROBIN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DODDATO, JOHN

Defendant

THOMAS, ROBIN

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/8/17

2/13/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/8/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (PLA FOLDER)

2/1/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (PLA FOLDER)

ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY JUDGE

2/1/2017: ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY JUDGE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

1/26/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

1/26/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/17/17 PARTY SERVED: ROBIN LYN THOMAS

1/20/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/17/17 PARTY SERVED: ROBIN LYN THOMAS

ANSWER BY ROBIN THOMAS

1/19/2017: ANSWER BY ROBIN THOMAS

PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017006629

1/19/2017: PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017006629

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

1/12/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017004605

1/12/2017: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017004605

SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFF'S

1/12/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFF'S

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/12/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/12/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/8/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (PLA FOLDER)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION AS TO COUNT ONE ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ENTRY OF DEFAULT BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT-RESIDENTAL EVICTION (FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT) (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT/FAILURE TO DEPOSIT RENT

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER BY ROBIN THOMAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $1.00 RECEIPT #2017006629

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017004605

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO THE PLAINTIFF'S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/12/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000075 EV

    Read MoreRead Less