Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 12/20/2020 at 19:49:22 (UTC).

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC vs. DREPAUL, EDMOND

Case Summary

On 05/04/2018 DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against DREPAUL, EDMOND. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 MF

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DITECH FINANCIAL LLC FKA GREEN TREE SERVICING LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

DREPAUL, TAMARA

DREPAUL, EDMOND

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ABN AMRO MORTGAGE GROUP INC

PEBBLE POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, JUSTIN ANDREW

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (REC)

7/26/2019: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (REC)

REQUEST FOR RECORDING

7/10/2019: REQUEST FOR RECORDING

NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

7/3/2018: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

COVER LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY

7/3/2018: COVER LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

6/21/2018: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

6/11/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

5/30/2018: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

5/29/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 2

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

5/29/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT # 1

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 5/9/2018@1108AM PARTY SERVED: PEBBLE POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

5/16/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 5/9/2018@1108AM PARTY SERVED: PEBBLE POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/3/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/3/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/3/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/3/2018: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

5/3/2018: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

5/3/2018: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

5/3/2018: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

5/3/2018: CIVIL COVER SHEET

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR RECORDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF BORROWER NONPARTICIPATION WITH RMFM PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COVER LETTER TO JUDGE FROM ATTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PEBBLE POINTE HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where ABN AMRO Mortgage Group, Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Ditech Financial LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, JUSTIN AARON