This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 12:49:42 (UTC).

DISCOVER BANK vs. DEBORAH M BURNHAM

Case Summary

On 03/14/2017 DISCOVER BANK filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DEBORAH M BURNHAM. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 SP

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DISCOVER BANK

Defendant

DEBORAH M BURNHAM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IN AID OF EXECUTION

7/19/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IN AID OF EXECUTION

NOTICE OF FILING SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

8/22/2018: NOTICE OF FILING SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

8/22/2018: MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

8/22/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017103184

10/27/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017103184

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

10/26/2017: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

PRE-TRIAL - NO PROOF OF SERVICE - FLOAT

4/18/2017: PRE-TRIAL - NO PROOF OF SERVICE - FLOAT

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

3/15/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

3/14/2017: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2018106288

11/5/2018: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2018106288

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEBORAH M BURNHAM

8/24/2018: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEBORAH M BURNHAM

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

8/22/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT

12/8/2017: PRE-TRIAL HEARING. DEF. FTA. ATTY TO SUBMIT DEFAULT JUDGMENT

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

10/30/2017: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR DEBORAH BURNAHM

4/19/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR DEBORAH BURNAHM

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017028094

3/16/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017028094

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/14/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

$ 4246.65 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

3/14/2017: $ 4246.65 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IN AID OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2018106288

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DEBORAH M BURNHAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING SUPPORTING AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MILITARY STATUS AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATION OF TAXABLE COSTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/18/2017
  • HearingEvent: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: PRE-TRIAL/MEDIATION ROOM 1400; Result: NO PROOF OF SERVICE / FLOAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PRE-TRIAL - NO PROOF OF SERVICE - FLOAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017028094

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: SMALL CLAIMS ATTORNEY PRE-TRIAL MEDIATION SET FOR 04/18/2017 AT 9:00 AM IN 1400 BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 4246.65 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/14/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 SC 000992 SP

    Read MoreRead Less