Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 15:46:08 (UTC).

DIABLO PROPERTIES INC vs. SANTANA, ALBA A

Case Summary

On 01/10/2017 DIABLO PROPERTIES INC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against SANTANA, ALBA A. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DIABLO PROPERTIES INC

Defendants

FREEMAN, JOSE A

SANTANA, ALBA A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KRIMKO, DIANE

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/3/17

2/8/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/3/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

1/31/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED JOSE A. FREEMAN DATE SERVED: 1/13/17

1/24/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED JOSE A. FREEMAN DATE SERVED: 1/13/17

SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED ALBA SANTANA DATE SERVED: 1/13/17

1/24/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED ALBA SANTANA DATE SERVED: 1/13/17

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

1/24/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

1/24/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

1/24/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/18/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017003871

1/11/2017: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017003871

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

1/10/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/10/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/10/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/10/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/10/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT I ONLY FOR POSSESSION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/3/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT 1 ONLY FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED JOSE A. FREEMAN DATE SERVED: 1/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED ALBA SANTANA DATE SERVED: 1/13/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017003871

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/10/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000052 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRIMKO, DIANE