This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 08/18/2023 at 02:12:52 (UTC).

DEMARCO, TAMARA CELINA vs DEMARCO, MAXIMO

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 DEMARCO, TAMARA CELINA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against DEMARCO, MAXIMO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are COLLINS, CHRISTY C, Z TORRES, ALFRED and Z ALVAREZ, FLAVIO. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 DC

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

COLLINS, CHRISTY C

Z TORRES, ALFRED

Z ALVAREZ, FLAVIO

 

Party Details

Petitioner

DEMARCO, TAMARA CELINA

Respondents

DEMARCO, MAXIMO

DEMARCO AS CO-TRUSTEE, MAXIMO

Not Yet Classified

DEMARCO, XAVIER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

LLABONA, NELSON ESQ

Respondent Attorney

BOURNE, J CRAIG

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

08/16/2023

HearingEvent: MOTION FOR CONTEMPT; Judge: COLLINS, CHRISTY C; Location: VIRTUAL HEARING; Result: HEARING HELD

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.6459.2400. / 2023108587)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEntry: VITAL STATISTICS FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER REGARDING MARITAL HOME

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/16/2023

DocketEntry: COURT NOTES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY'S FEES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 2023067351; Applied Amount: $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/06/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $60.00 RECEIPT #2023067351PAYMENT FOR TAMARA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/05/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 2023067013; Applied Amount: $60.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
44 More Docket Entries
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR CELINA

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/20/2022

DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less