This case was last updated from Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County on 12/19/2021 at 17:12:15 (UTC).

CUSTOMERS BANK vs. DELOS CONSTRUCTION LLC

Case Summary

On 10/20/2021 CUSTOMERS BANK filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DELOS CONSTRUCTION LLC. This case was filed in Ninth Circuit Courts - Osceola County, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CUSTOMERS BANK

Defendants

DELOS CONSTRUCTION LLC

CAT AND I LLC

MATTHEWS, JOHN 3

MATTHEWS, EMILY

CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY

GREATAMERICA FINANCIAL SERVICES CORPORATION

PAWNEE LEASING CORPORATION

AMUR EQUIPMENT FINANCE INC

BLUE RIDGE FINANCIAL LLC

BUSINESS CAPITAL PROVIDERS INC

FIRST CAPITAL SOLUTIONS INC

CFG MERCHANT SERVICES LLC

CT CORPORATION SYSTEM

KUBOTA CREDIT CORPORATION USA

FIRST CORPORATE SOLUTIONS INC

MERIDIAN EQUIPMENT FINANCE LLC

MCA REHAB LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WEBB, JAMES J. ESQ

Defendant Attorney

GROSSMAN, GREG

 

Court Documents

COMMERCIAL FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

10/20/2021: COMMERCIAL FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DELOS CONSTRUCTION LLC

11/18/2021: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST DELOS CONSTRUCTION LLC

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST CAT & I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST JOHN MATTHEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST EMILY MATTHEWS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER TO COMMERCIAL FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 11/19/2021 PARTY SERVED: CAT & I LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2021094450

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - SUMMONS/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMMERCIAL FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/20/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 002779 CI

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CAT & I LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where MCA REHAB, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BLUE BRIDGE FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Customers Bank, Inc. is a litigant