This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/06/2021 at 04:33:41 (UTC).

COUNTRY CLUB VILLAGE MOBILE HOME PARK vs. NEGRON PACHECO, AMERIE

Case Summary

On 04/11/2019 COUNTRY CLUB VILLAGE MOBILE HOME PARK filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against NEGRON PACHECO, AMERIE. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 EV

  • Filing Date:

    04/11/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTRY CLUB VILLAGE MOBILE HOME PARK

Defendants

NEGRON PACHECO, AMERIE

ALVAREZ, MICHAEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN, ANTONIO G

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

9/9/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

AMENDED MOTION FOR REHEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

8/27/2019: AMENDED MOTION FOR REHEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

7/23/2019: ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT

4/25/2019: ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019039692

4/18/2019: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2019039692

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019037522

4/12/2019: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019037522

SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ALVAREZ (EMAILED TO ATTY)

4/11/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ALVAREZ (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/11/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/11/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

9/20/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED (OR.5586.540. / 2019115996)

9/9/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED (OR.5586.540. / 2019115996)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BY DEFAUT

5/9/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION BY DEFAUT

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) \ CAN'T DEFAULT \ ANSWER FILED ON 4/25/19

5/2/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) \ CAN'T DEFAULT \ ANSWER FILED ON 4/25/19

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 4/18/19 PARTY SERVED: AMERIE NEGRON PACHECO

4/26/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 4/18/19 PARTY SERVED: AMERIE NEGRON PACHECO

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

4/17/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/17/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

4/11/2019: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT

4/11/2019: TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED (OR.5586.540. / 2019115996)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED MOTION FOR REHEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/27/2019 AT 10:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019037522

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED MICHAEL ALVAREZ (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: TENANT EVICTION COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/11/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 001092 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Antonio Giovonnie