This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 01/13/2023 at 03:10:32 (UTC).

COKER, JANICE vs. EGDON HEATH INVESTMENTS, LLC

Case Summary

On 10/28/2010 COKER, JANICE filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against EGDON HEATH INVESTMENTS, LLC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are POLODNA, SCOTT and FLEMING, JEFFREY M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

POLODNA, SCOTT

FLEMING, JEFFREY M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WARRY PEARS, EDMUND RICHARD

PATEL, MINESH

GILL, AMARJIT KAUR

COKER, PAUL

PATEL, ALKESH

MUNGO PEARS, EDMUND ROBERT ANTHONY

RANDALL, IAN

PEGLER, COLIN

Defendants

FAKESS, VAUGHN

MY APPRAISER & ASSOCIATES INC.

CLAYTON ROPER & MARSHALL, INC.

EGDON HEATH INVESTMENTS, LLC

NETRAM, CHRIS M.

FULBRIGHT, JAY

SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC.

GOLD EAGLE APPRAISALS, INC.

HILL, MELISSA

SNOEBLEN, ROY

HANCOCK BANK

SCHRAMM, CHRISTOPHER

4 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SALPETER, ERIC T ESQ

Defendant Attorneys

BENNETT, BRIAN W. ESQ

KOLEOS, DANIEL J

COHEN, DAVID S

LUNNY, GREGORY F. ESQ

JOHNSON, STEVEN W

CHAPMAN, VICTOR L. ESQ

ALBAUGH, MITCHELL E. ESQ

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/28/2010: CIVIL COVER SHEET

AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET (COMPLEX LITIGATION ADDENDUM ATTACHED)

11/8/2010: AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET (COMPLEX LITIGATION ADDENDUM ATTACHED)

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/08/10 PARTY SERVED: MY APPRAISER & ASSOCIATES INC. (DEFENDANT);

12/9/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/08/10 PARTY SERVED: MY APPRAISER & ASSOCIATES INC. (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:12/07/10 PARTY SERVED: ROY SNOEBLEN (DEFENDANT);

12/9/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED:12/07/10 PARTY SERVED: ROY SNOEBLEN (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 12/07/10 PARTY SERVED: JAVIER PAMIAS (DEFENDANT);

12/9/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 12/07/10 PARTY SERVED: JAVIER PAMIAS (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED:12/06/10 PARTY SERVED: CHRIS M. NETRAM (DEFENDANT);

12/9/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED:12/06/10 PARTY SERVED: CHRIS M. NETRAM (DEFENDANT);

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/10/10 PARTY SERVED: VAUGHN FAKESS

12/13/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 12/10/10 PARTY SERVED: VAUGHN FAKESS

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/9/10 PARTY SERVED: SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC

12/20/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/9/10 PARTY SERVED: SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/8/10 PARTY SERVED: CLAYTON ROPER & MARSHALL, INC

12/20/2010: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/8/10 PARTY SERVED: CLAYTON ROPER & MARSHALL, INC

70 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/28/2014
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (REC)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/07/2014
  • DocketEntry: JOINT STIPULATION FOR DISISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/23/2013
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT, STEFANY L. BEALS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2013
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2013
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT, JAY FULBRIGHT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2013
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO DEFENDANT, SUNTRUST MORTGAGE, INC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/31/2012
  • DocketEntry: JUDGE POLODNA, SCOTT: ASSIGNED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/05/2012
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC.'S E-SERVICE DESIGNATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2012
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE ONLY AS TO DEFENDANTS, MY APPRAISER & ASSOCIATES INC. AND MELISSA HILL (EW)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
121 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2010
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 12/08/10 PARTY SERVED: MY APPRAISER & ASSOCIATES INC. (DEFENDANT);

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 157616; Applied Amount: $120.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2010
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RECEIPT: 157616 DATE: 12/03/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 154599; Applied Amount: $138.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2010
  • DocketEntry: COPIES CIRCUIT CIVIL RECEIPT: 154599 DATE: 11/09/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/08/2010
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET (COMPLEX LITIGATION ADDENDUM ATTACHED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2010
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 153112; Applied Amount: $400.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketEntry: CIRCUIT CIVIL FILING RECEIPT: 153112 DATE: 10/29/2010

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2010
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SUNTRUST MORTGAGE INC is a litigant

Latest cases where HANCOCK BANK is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENNETT , BRIAN W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MITCHELL ALBAUGH