This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/26/2023 at 15:09:51 (UTC).

CITIBANK N.A. vs. MUNOZ, ROBERTO

Case Summary

On 01/12/2023 CITIBANK N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MUNOZ, ROBERTO. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 SP

  • Filing Date:

    01/12/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK N.A.

Defendant

MUNOZ, ROBERTO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAVRAR, FLYNN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/12/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 4,812.57 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

1/12/2023: $ 4,812.57 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

1/12/2023: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/12/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

1/12/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/12/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023005247

1/17/2023: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023005247

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2023
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4B

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023005247; Applied Amount: $310.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023005247

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 02/07/2023 AT 9:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF LEAD ATTORNEY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 4,812.57 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/12/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000190 SP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less