This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/25/2022 at 17:10:39 (UTC).

CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY vs. ENCARNACION, LUIS MANUEL

Case Summary

On 04/26/2022 CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ENCARNACION, LUIS MANUEL. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************3 MF

  • Filing Date:

    04/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY

Defendant

ENCARNACION, LUIS MANUEL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHURCH, KELLY

 

Court Documents

VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

4/20/2022: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

4/20/2022: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/20/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/20/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/20/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

4/20/2022: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER ROM LIHSYNG STANFORD LEE AND SHAW FUNG LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 5/11/2022@637PM PARTY SERVED: LUIS MANUEL ENCARNCION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 5/11/2022@637PM PARTY SERVED: ESPERANZA MANJARRES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 5/13/2022@850AM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LIHSYNG STANFORD EE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 5/13/2022@850AM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF SHAW FUNG LEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 5/2/2022@1055AM PARTY SERVED: SARATOGA PARK HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022039063; Applied Amount: $985.00

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: FORM A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE MORTGAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/26/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001033 MF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CITIBANK NA NOT IN ITS INDIVIDUAL CAPACITY BUT SOLEY AS TRUSTEE OF CRZ PASS-THROUGH TRUST VI is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Church, Kelley Louise