This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 01/05/2021 at 17:43:09 (UTC).

CIP 14 PRM SUNRISE OWNER LLC vs. PENA, MILQUELLA

Case Summary

On 03/04/2019 CIP 14 PRM SUNRISE OWNER LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against PENA, MILQUELLA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GABRIELLE and SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 EV

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GABRIELLE

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CIP 14 PRM SUNRISE OWNER LLC

Defendants

PENA, PAMELA

PENA, MILQUELLA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRON, JAMES I III

 

Court Documents

LETTER FROM TRANSUNION

11/6/2019: LETTER FROM TRANSUNION

LETTER FROM TRANSUNION

10/28/2019: LETTER FROM TRANSUNION

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

4/23/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

4/3/2019: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND PAY (NO ENVELOPES) (FTJ)

4/1/2019: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND PAY (NO ENVELOPES) (FTJ)

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION (COUNT I)

3/27/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION-RESIDENTIAL EVICTION (COUNT I)

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 3/9/19 PARTY SERVED: MILQUELLA PENA (CO-RESIDENT)

3/27/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 3/9/19 PARTY SERVED: MILQUELLA PENA (CO-RESIDENT)

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 3/9/19 PARTY SERVED: MILQUELLA PENA

3/27/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 3/9/19 PARTY SERVED: MILQUELLA PENA

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE/AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR POSSESSION

3/27/2019: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE/AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY)\ DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/29/19

3/27/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY)\ DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/29/19

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

3/11/2019: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019023205

3/6/2019: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019023205

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

3/5/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/4/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/4/2019: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/4/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM TRANSUNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: LETTER FROM TRANSUNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION(FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON DEF'S MOTION TO STAY (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION - RECORDED (OR.5501.2664. / 2019041869)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY AND PAY (NO ENVELOPES) (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE/AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY)\ DEFAULT ENTERED ON 3/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2019023205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/04/2019 CASE NUMBER 2019 CC 000701 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRON JAMES I III