Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/15/2020 at 05:42:07 (UTC).

CHAMPIONSGATE MASTERS ASSOCIATION, INC. vs. LI, LING

Case Summary

On 02/23/2017 CHAMPIONSGATE MASTERS ASSOCIATION, INC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LI, LING. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 CF

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CHAMPIONSGATE MASTERS ASSOCIATION, INC.

Defendants

#2, UNKNOWN

#1, UNKNOWN

LING LI, UNKNOWN

SHOU, WEISHU

LI, LING

WEISHU SHOU, UNKNOWN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTTMANN, DAVID

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

12/8/2017: NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR LING LI

6/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR LING LI

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR WEISHU SHOU

6/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR WEISHU SHOU

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WEISHUU SHOU

6/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WEISHUU SHOU

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #1

6/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #1

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LING LI

6/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LING LI

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #2

6/8/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #2

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: AUGUST 1ST 2017 FROM WEISHU SHU, LING LI, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WEISHU SHU, UNKNOWN SPOUSE LING LI, UNKNOWN TENANTS #1 & # 2

6/12/2017: NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: AUGUST 1ST 2017 FROM WEISHU SHU, LING LI, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WEISHU SHU, UNKNOWN SPOUSE LING LI, UNKNOWN TENANTS #1 & # 2

AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION - DILIGENT SEARCH WEISHU SHOU

6/7/2017: AFFIDAVIT FOR SERVICE BY PUBLICATION - DILIGENT SEARCH WEISHU SHOU

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

2/23/2017: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/23/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DISCHARGE OF LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF FILING PROOF OF PUBLICATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF ACTION ANSWER BY: AUGUST 1ST 2017 FROM WEISHU SHU, LING LI, UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WEISHU SHU, UNKNOWN SPOUSE LING LI, UNKNOWN TENANTS #1 & # 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR LING LI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR WEISHU SHOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF WEISHUU SHOU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT #1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LING LI

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/23/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000465 CF

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CHAMPIONSGATE MASTER ASSOCIATION INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVID ROTTMANN