Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 16:01:19 (UTC).

CENTENNIAL MEADOWS LLC vs. OTERO, JOHN

Case Summary

On 01/11/2017 CENTENNIAL MEADOWS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against OTERO, JOHN. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CENTENNIAL MEADOWS LLC

Defendant

OTERO, JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BARRON, JAMES I III

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/20/17

2/22/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/20/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

2/10/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE/AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR POSSESSION

2/3/2017: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE/AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

2/3/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/13/17 PARTY SERVED: JOHN OTERO

2/3/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/13/17 PARTY SERVED: JOHN OTERO

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/17/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017004580

1/12/2017: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017004580

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

1/11/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/11/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/11/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 1 )

1/11/2017: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 1 )

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/11/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/20/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY THE WRIT OF POSSESSION (GRANTED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AFFIDAVIT AS TO MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE/AFFIDAVIT AS TO SUPPORT OF FINAL JUDGEMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/13/17 PARTY SERVED: JOHN OTERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2017004580

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/11/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000058 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BARRON JAMES I III