This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/04/2022 at 17:20:00 (UTC).

CASTILLO, TERESA vs. ARGUELLO, JENNIFER

Case Summary

On 07/06/2022 CASTILLO, TERESA filed an Other lawsuit against ARGUELLO, JENNIFER. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EGAN, ROBERT J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 OC

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EGAN, ROBERT J

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CASTILLO, TERESA

Defendants

ARGUELLO, JENNIFER

HARRINGTON, MARY JANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HERRON, MARK

Defendant Attorneys

SASSO, MICHAEL A

BLEAKLEY, JUSTIN M

 

Court Documents

FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6271.959. / 2022127032)

8/17/2022: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6271.959. / 2022127032)

MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT, JENNIFER ARGUELLO, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

8/8/2022: MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT, JENNIFER ARGUELLO, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

PLAINTIFF TERESA CASTILLO'S BRIEF ON MERITS

8/8/2022: PLAINTIFF TERESA CASTILLO'S BRIEF ON MERITS

AMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

8/4/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

DEFENDANT JENNIFER ARGUELLO'S ANSWER TO TERESA CASTILLO'S COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

8/3/2022: DEFENDANT JENNIFER ARGUELLO'S ANSWER TO TERESA CASTILLO'S COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

NOTICE OF SHORT MATTER HEARING

8/1/2022: NOTICE OF SHORT MATTER HEARING

DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

8/1/2022: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

7/21/2022: NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 7/14/22 FOR JENNIFER ARGUELLO

7/19/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED ON 7/14/22 FOR JENNIFER ARGUELLO

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

7/19/2022: DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

7/19/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SHORT MATTER HEARING

7/18/2022: NOTICE OF SHORT MATTER HEARING

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 7/14/2022@1130AM PARTY SERVED: JENNIFER ARGUELLO

7/18/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 7/14/2022@1130AM PARTY SERVED: JENNIFER ARGUELLO

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

7/7/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 7/12/2022@410PM PARTY SERVED: OSCEOLA COUNTY SUPERVIOSR OF ELECTIONS

7/13/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 7/12/2022@410PM PARTY SERVED: OSCEOLA COUNTY SUPERVIOSR OF ELECTIONS

DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

7/13/2022: DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO CONVENE A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

7/8/2022: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO CONVENE A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022062836

7/8/2022: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022062836

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6271.959. / 2022127032)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2022
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF; Judge: EGAN, ROBERT J; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2022
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Judge: EGAN, ROBERT J; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MEMORANDUM OF DEFENDANT, JENNIFER ARGUELLO, IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF TERESA CASTILLO'S BRIEF ON MERITS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: FINAL HEARING SET FOR 08/10/2022 AT 3:30 PM IN 5C BEFORE JUDGE: EGAN, ROBERT J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • HearingEvent: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE; Judge: EGAN, ROBERT J; Location: COURTROOM 5C; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED NOTICE OF FINAL HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT JENNIFER ARGUELLO'S ANSWER TO TERESA CASTILLO'S COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/08/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022062836; Applied Amount: $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR THE COURT TO CONVENE A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2022062836

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRIORITY STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR EMERGENCY DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/06/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001745 OC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL A SASSO, ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BLEAKLEY, JUSTIN M