This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 11/05/2023 at 17:29:30 (UTC).

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA vs. R & J PAINTING SOLUTIONS CORP BY SERVING RICARDO ARANGUREN AS REGISTERED AGENT

Case Summary

On 09/06/2023 NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA filed an Other lawsuit against R J PAINTING SOLUTIONS CORP BY SERVING RICARDO ARANGUREN AS REGISTERED AGENT. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************9 CL

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY A PENNSYLVANIA CORPORATION AUTHORIZED TO DO BUSINESS IN THE STATE OF FLORIDA

Defendant

R & J PAINTING SOLUTIONS CORP BY SERVING RICARDO ARANGUREN AS REGISTERED AGENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHER, STACEY S

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/02/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICEOF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF PROOF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/02/2023

DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/12/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 10/4/2023@833AM PARTY SERVED: R & J PAINTING SOLUTIONS CORP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 2023086808; Applied Amount: $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/08/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023086808

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/06/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CC 003959 CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less