This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 10/29/2023 at 17:16:25 (UTC).

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC vs. CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON

Case Summary

On 08/30/2023 THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC filed an Other lawsuit against CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 CL

  • Filing Date:

    08/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

THE KIDWELL GROUP LLC

Defendant

CERTAIN UNDERWRITERS AT LLOYDS LONDON

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BALYASNY, MONICA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

8/30/2023: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

09/26/2023

DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/26/2023

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketEntry: UNDERWRITERS MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIMETO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2023

DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY WITHIN FIRM AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/20/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 2023085673; Applied Amount: $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023085673

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketEntry: PROPOSED GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/30/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/30/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CC 003895 CL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less