This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/20/2023 at 17:30:02 (UTC).

GONZALES, MARIA vs. TECO ENERGY INC.

Case Summary

On 03/21/2023 GONZALES, MARIA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against TECO ENERGY INC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 ON

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GONZALES, MARIA

Defendants

TECO ENERGY INC.

DALCOR AFFORDABLE HOUSING I, LLC

DALCOR REEF CLUB LTD

DALCOR REEF CLUB GP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PATTERSON, MARK

WEBER, BRANDEN

 

Court Documents

E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE-MISSING CMO & SUMMONS

3/25/2023: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE-MISSING CMO & SUMMONS

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/28/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/28/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/28/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

3/28/2023: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

3/30/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2023034461

4/6/2023: PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2023034461

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

4/6/2023: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

4/6/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2023
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2023034461; Applied Amount: $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES FOR SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $440.00 RECEIPT #2023034461

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE-MISSING CMO & SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/22/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/22/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 002017 ON

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/21/2023
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less