This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/30/2023 at 17:44:58 (UTC).

SANTOS, CARMEN vs. CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 08/31/2023 SANTOS, CARMEN filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/31/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

SANTOS, CARMEN

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LEVIN, YITZHAK

Defendant Attorney

WILT, ALEXIS

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

8/31/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

8/31/2023: COMPLAINT

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

9/6/2023: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE 69B-220.201 ADJUSTER ETHICS AND FLORIDA EVIDENCE CODE 90.202 AND 90.203

9/6/2023: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE 69B-220.201 ADJUSTER ETHICS AND FLORIDA EVIDENCE CODE 90.202 AND 90.203

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

9/6/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

REQUEST TO PRODUCTION

9/6/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCTION

E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE- MISSING CMO

9/11/2023: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE- MISSING CMO

GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

9/11/2023: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

9/12/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

CITIZENS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFF'S COMPLAINT

10/9/2023: CITIZENS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFF'S COMPLAINT

COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

10/16/2023: COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

CITIZENS' ANSWERS, DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

10/18/2023: CITIZENS' ANSWERS, DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

10/18/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CITIZENS' ANSWERS, DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/16/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/09/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CITIZENS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINITFF'S COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/12/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/11/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE- MISSING CMO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: REQUEST TO PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF FILING REQUEST FOR DEPOSITION AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE OF FLORIDA ADMINISTRATIVE CODE 69B-220.201 ADJUSTER ETHICS AND FLORIDA EVIDENCE CODE 90.202 AND 90.203

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/06/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (NEED CMO AO021-04 TO ISSUE)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 2023085586; Applied Amount: $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/05/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023085586

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/31/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/31/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 004225 CI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less