This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/07/2023 at 17:29:27 (UTC).

ELEVATION PRESTON COVE, LLC vs. ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/08/2023 ELEVATION PRESTON COVE, LLC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 CI

  • Filing Date:

    08/08/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ELEVATION PRESTON COVE, LLC

Defendant

ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GARCIA, SUSANA CRISTINA

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

8/8/2023: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

 

Docket Entries

10/05/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (RECORDING FEES NOT PAID)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/05/2023

DocketEntry: COUNTERCLAIM FILED DEFENDANT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT AND COUNTERCLAIM (FEES NOT PAID)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 08/17/23 PARTY SERVED: ADAMS HOMES OF NORTHWEST FLORIDA, INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/15/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2023

DocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

FinancialReceipt Number: 2023078242; Applied Amount: $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE-MISSING CMO

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/09/2023

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2023078242

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED- (NOT ISSUED- MISSING CMO)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023
View Court Documents

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/08/2023

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 08/08/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 004041 CI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less