This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/09/2023 at 03:16:32 (UTC).

CONYERS, MICHAEL vs. CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 10/22/2022 CONYERS, MICHAEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is YOUNG, TOM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************5 CI

  • Filing Date:

    10/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

YOUNG, TOM

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CONYERS, MICHAEL

CONYERS, ASHLEY ELIZABETH

Defendant

CITIZENS PROPERTY INSURANCE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANAURA, ESQ., JOSE MIGUEL

Defendant Attorney

ROGERS, ROBERT L III

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

06/20/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/16/2023

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
05/01/2023

DocketEntry: AGREED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/17/2023

DocketEntry: LETTER DATED APRIL 17, 2023 RE: PROPOSED AGREED ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (NO ORDER ATTACHED)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2023

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANT'S FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES AND FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF ASHLEY ELIZABETH CONYERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketEntry: DEFENDANT NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL CONYERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF ASHLEY ELIZABETH CONYERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF DEFENDANT FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL CONYERS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/09/2023

DocketEntry: DEFENDNAT FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
10/26/2022

FinancialReceipt Number: 2022098746; Applied Amount: $410.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2022

DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022098746

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/22/2022

DocketEntry: CASE FILED 10/22/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 002765 CI

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/21/2022

DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less