*************5 SP
01/30/2023
Pending - Other Pending
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Not Classified By Court
Osceola, Florida
ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E
CAPITAL ONE, N.A.
BALL, MICHAEL H
DEBSKI, MICHAEL THIEL ESQ
1/30/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET
1/30/2023: $ 1,735.03 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
1/30/2023: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK)
1/31/2023: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
1/31/2023: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
DocketEntry: NOTICE AND REQUIREMENT TO ATTEND MEDIATION
[-] Read LessHearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E; Location: COURTROOM 4E; Result: HEARING HELD
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 2/20/2023 PARTY SERVED: MICHAEL H BALL
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 03/17/2023 AT 10:00 AM IN 4E BEFORE JUDGE: ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK) - STRICKEN
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: $ 1,735.03 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET
[-] Read LessDocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/30/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 SC 000555 SP
[-] Read Less