This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 03/06/2022 at 20:59:23 (UTC).

CAMPBELL, MARLENE E vs CAMPBELL, ERROL H

Case Summary

On 12/09/2021 CAMPBELL, MARLENE E filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against CAMPBELL, ERROL H. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S and NETCHER, ERIC J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************7 DC

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S

NETCHER, ERIC J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

CAMPBELL, MARLENE E

Respondent

CAMPBELL, ERROL H

Not Yet Classified

CAMPBELL, AARON RYAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTIN, ANTONIO G ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: VITAL STATISTICS FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE - RECORDED (OR.6133.2005. / 2022011027)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022003955; Applied Amount: $10.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.50 RECEIPT #2022003955

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021111398; Applied Amount: $397.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $397.50 RECEIPT #2021111398

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE AND WAIVER OF SERVICE OF PROCESS BY SHERIFF

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: AGREED PARENTING PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF COMPLETION FOR MARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR MARLENE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: SPECIAL AFFIDAVIT FOR UNCONTESTED/ AGREED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITHOUT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR ERROL (BLANK FROM/ NOT SIGNED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION AND ENFORCEMENT ACT (UCCJEA) AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH DEPENDENT OR MINOR CHILD(REN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 12/09/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 004767 DC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Martin, Antonio Giovonnie