This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 06/06/2022 at 17:05:58 (UTC).

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC vs. NIEVES, ERIC

Case Summary

On 04/07/2022 BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against NIEVES, ERIC. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 SP

  • Filing Date:

    04/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC ASSIGNEE OF COMENITY CAPITAL BANK

BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC

Defendant

NIEVES, ERIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FAGEN, JESSICA J

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

4/7/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 3665.11 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

4/7/2022: $ 3665.11 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/7/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

4/7/2022: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

4/7/2022: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022034899

4/14/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022034899

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

4/23/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

4/23/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR ERIC NIEVES

5/9/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR ERIC NIEVES

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/10/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022044027

5/12/2022: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022044027

ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

5/18/2022: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5/19/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

5/19/2022: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/06/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 07/06/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022044027; Applied Amount: $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022044027

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR ERIC NIEVES

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 05/13/2022 AT 9:30 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022034899; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022034899

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 3665.11 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 04/07/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 001786 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BUREAUS INVESTMENT GROUP PORTFOLIO NO 15 LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FAGEN , JESSICA J