This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/15/2020 at 15:12:17 (UTC).

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY vs. IZQUIERDO, MARLENIS

Case Summary

On 03/23/2017 BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY filed an Other lawsuit against IZQUIERDO, MARLENIS. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE and EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 CL

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BRANCH BANKING AND TRUST COMPANY

Defendant

IZQUIERDO, MARLENIS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AVRUTIS, THOMAS L.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF MAILING

3/21/2019: NOTICE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2019025398

3/12/2019: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2019025398

AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING

12/13/2018: AMENDED ORDER ON MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING

AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT & DAMAGES

11/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF DEFAULT & DAMAGES

AFFIDAVIT REGARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES

11/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT REGARDING ATTORNEY'S FEES

AFFIDAVIT OF TIME SPENT

11/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF TIME SPENT

AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST AND COURT COSTS

11/14/2018: AFFIDAVIT OF INTEREST AND COURT COSTS

MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

11/14/2018: MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT AND MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS FEES

NOTICE OF MAILING

5/9/2018: NOTICE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT AS TO PROPER VENUE AND MILITARY STATUS

4/18/2018: AFFIDAVIT AS TO PROPER VENUE AND MILITARY STATUS

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 12/23/17 PARTY SERVED: MARLENIS IZQUIERDO

1/3/2018: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 12/23/17 PARTY SERVED: MARLENIS IZQUIERDO

PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017118892

12/18/2017: PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2017118892

ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/13/2017: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017031370

3/27/2017: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017031370

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

3/24/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED MELENIS IZQUIERDO (EMAILED TO ATTY)

3/24/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED MELENIS IZQUIERDO (EMAILED TO ATTY)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/23/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/23/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO FACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • HearingEvent: MOTION TO COMPEL; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION FOR TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO COMPEL SET FOR 05/23/2019 AT 10:30 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION REQUESTING TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE AT HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO COMPEL DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO FACT INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2019025398

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 12/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ALIAS SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2017031370

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED MELENIS IZQUIERDO (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/23/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000716 CL

    Read MoreRead Less