This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/08/2023 at 10:31:47 (UTC).

BONET, MANUEL vs. AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/28/2022 BONET, MANUEL filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is ALVARO, CHAD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************4 CI

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

ALVARO, CHAD

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BONET, MANUEL

BONET, MARIA

Defendant

AMERICAN TRADITIONS INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CANAURA, ESQ., JOSE MIGUEL

Defendant Attorney

EWIN, DANIEL J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2023
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • DocketEntry: MEDIATION REPORT AND NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY PRUSUANT TO RULE 1.720(E)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE THAT VERIFIED ANSWER TO INTERRORGATORIES HAVE BEEN SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDANT'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFFS' REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE THAT ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES HAVE BEEN SERVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 08/04/2022
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022070797; Applied Amount: $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022070797

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001974 CI

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF SERVICE OF FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFFS' FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less