This case was last updated from Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/28/2022 at 17:20:04 (UTC).

BERUBE, DENNIS vs. ORLANDO CREMATORY, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 BERUBE, DENNIS filed an Other lawsuit against ORLANDO CREMATORY, LLC. This case was filed in Osceola County - Ninth Judicial Circuit Court, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCHREIBER, MARGARET H. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************6 OC

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCHREIBER, MARGARET H

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BERUBE, DENNIS

Defendant

ORLANDO CREMATORY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARTIN, ANTONIO G

Defendant Attorney

VRBENSKY, JASON B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2022
  • DocketEntry: DEFENDAT, ORLANDO CREMATORY, LLC'S MOION TO DISMISS PLANITIFF'S VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, CORPORATE SERVED DATE SERVED : 7/27/22 PARTY SERVED: ORLANDO CREMATORY, LLC C/O RA JANENE ASHLEY RHODES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022060291; Applied Amount: $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022060291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE - CMO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/29/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CA 001676 OC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: VERIFIED COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: EXHIBIT A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VRBENSKY JASON B