This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 05/20/2022 at 17:03:39 (UTC).

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. vs. DELVALLE, OSCAR

Case Summary

On 03/21/2022 BANK OF AMERICA, N A filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DELVALLE, OSCAR. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SP

  • Filing Date:

    03/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.

Defendant

DELVALLE, OSCAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DRAGUTSKY, JASON S

Defendant Attorney

BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

3/21/2022: PROPOSED STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/25/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

3/25/2022: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 4/4/2022 PARTY SERVED: OSCAR DELVALLE

4/6/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 4/4/2022 PARTY SERVED: OSCAR DELVALLE

CIVIL COVER SHEET

3/21/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

$ 4594.05 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

3/21/2022: $ 4594.05 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

3/21/2022: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

3/21/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

3/21/2022: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022027637

3/24/2022: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022027637

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

4/18/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

4/19/2022: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

4/21/2022: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

ORDER ADTOPYING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

4/21/2022: ORDER ADTOPYING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C; Location: COURTROOM 4B; Result: CANCELLED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADTOPYING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ADOPTING STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SETTLEMENT STIPULATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANT AND DESIGNATION OF SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 4/4/2022 PARTY SERVED: OSCAR DELVALLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 04/22/2022 AT 11:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2022027637; Applied Amount: $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022027637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PROPOSED STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: $ 4594.05 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 03/21/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 SC 001348 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Bank of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BENENATI, WALTER F ESQ