This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 10/01/2021 at 15:04:11 (UTC).

ARRIOLA PALACIOS, CELSO L vs SOLANO MARTINEZ, HANSY

Case Summary

On 09/17/2021 ARRIOLA PALACIOS, CELSO L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOLANO MARTINEZ, HANSY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 DC

  • Filing Date:

    09/17/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

KRAYNICK, MICHAEL S

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARRIOLA PALACIOS, CELSO L

Respondent

SOLANO MARTINEZ, HANSY

Not Yet Classified

A, C

A, E

A, S

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARMONA, OMAR ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 9/21/2021 PARTY SERVED: HANSY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021083891; Applied Amount: $407.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2021083891

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN, ORANGE & OSCEOLA COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: BLANK NOTICE OF SERVICE TIME-SHARING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEMAND FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITH THE COURT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR CELSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 09/17/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 003551 DC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARMONA, OMAR ESQ