This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 09/28/2021 at 17:03:22 (UTC).

ARRIOLA PALACIOS, CELSO L vs SOLANO MARTINEZ, HANSY

Case Summary

On 07/30/2021 ARRIOLA PALACIOS, CELSO L filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against SOLANO MARTINEZ, HANSY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 DS

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

MADRIGAL, DIEGO M III

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ARRIOLA PALACIOS, CELSO L

Respondent

SOLANO MARTINEZ, HANSY

Not Yet Classified

C.A.

E.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

CARMONA, OMAR ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021069091; Applied Amount: $407.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $407.50 RECEIPT #2021069091

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • DocketEntry: AMENDED ORDER IMPLEMENTING A STANDING TEMP ORDER FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE ACTIONS WITH OR WITHOUT MINOR CHILDREN, ORANGE & OSCEOLA COUNTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: DEMAND FOR MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITIONER'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE TIME-SHARING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER FOR CELSO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION WITHIN COURT FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: PETITION FOR DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE AND OTHER RELIEF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: COVER SHEET FOR FAMILY COURT CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 07/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 DR 002920 DS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EA is a litigant

Latest cases where C.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CARMONA, OMAR ESQ