Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 07/06/2021 at 22:05:14 (UTC).

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O LOURDES PEREZ vs. INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 06/08/2021 APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O LOURDES PEREZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Not Classified By Court located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************8 SP

  • Filing Date:

    06/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Not Classified By Court

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

APEX AUTO GLASS LLC A/A/O LOURDES PEREZ

Defendant

INFINITY AUTO INSURANCE COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS, JACK WILLIAM

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2021
  • HearingEvent: PRETRIAL; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEntry: PRETRIAL SET FOR 08/13/2021 AT 10:45 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEntry: STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • FinancialReceipt Number: 2021052707; Applied Amount: $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $185.00 RECEIPT #2021052707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR NAME AND EMAIL ADDRESS TO OPT INTO VIRTUAL MEDIATION PROGRAM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY AND SECONDARY ELECTRONIC SERVICE EMAIL ADDRESSES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED & CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (GENERAL) WRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: $ 1427.85 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 06/08/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 SC 003068 SP

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where APEX AUTO GLASS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Infinity Auto Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM