Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/15/2020 at 00:47:58 (UTC).

AMEERALLY, JANETT vs. BLANCO, DANY M

Case Summary

On 02/09/2017 AMEERALLY, JANETT filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against BLANCO, DANY M. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 EV

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMEERALLY, JANETT

Defendants

BLANCO, DANY M

HERNANDEZ CABRERA, LUZ D

 

Court Documents

CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

7/25/2017: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

7/11/2017: CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

PAYMENT $1,500.00 RECEIPT #2017029108

3/20/2017: PAYMENT $1,500.00 RECEIPT #2017029108

EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/ EVIDENCE LOG

3/14/2017: EXHIBITS FOR IDENTIFICATION/ EVIDENCE LOG

PAYMENT $0.45 RECEIPT #2017021501

2/28/2017: PAYMENT $0.45 RECEIPT #2017021501

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

2/22/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PAYMENT $0.45 RECEIPT #2017016643

2/16/2017: PAYMENT $0.45 RECEIPT #2017016643

PAYMENT $2,500.00 RECEIPT #2017016642

2/16/2017: PAYMENT $2,500.00 RECEIPT #2017016642

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

2/9/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

PAYMENT $75.00 RECEIPT #2017073172

7/25/2017: PAYMENT $75.00 RECEIPT #2017073172

CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

7/25/2017: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

PAYMENT $1,225.50 RECEIPT #2017021637

2/28/2017: PAYMENT $1,225.50 RECEIPT #2017021637

PAYMENT $5.00 RECEIPT #2017021632

2/28/2017: PAYMENT $5.00 RECEIPT #2017021632

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

2/22/2017: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

PAYMENT $213.00 RECEIPT #2017014575

2/9/2017: PAYMENT $213.00 RECEIPT #2017014575

OWNERS AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER TO BRING EVICTION ACTION

2/9/2017: OWNERS AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER TO BRING EVICTION ACTION

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/9/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

2/9/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $75.00 RECEIPT #2017073172

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CLERK'S REGISTRY CHECK MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • HearingEvent: FINAL HEARING; Judge: EPPERSON, HAL C JR; Location: COURTROOM 5B; Result: HEARING HELD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CHECK REQUEST (EMAILED TO ACCT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL HEARING SET FOR 07/11/2017 AT 9:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $0.45 RECEIPT #2017016643

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $2,500.00 RECEIPT #2017016642

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $213.00 RECEIPT #2017014575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: OWNERS AUTHORIZATION FOR PROPERTY MANAGER TO BRING EVICTION ACTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/09/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000330 EV

    Read MoreRead Less