Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 14:16:51 (UTC).

ADP INVESTMENTS LLC vs. JOBSON, ALEJANDRA

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 ADP INVESTMENTS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against JOBSON, ALEJANDRA. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************1 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADP INVESTMENTS LLC

Defendants

JOBSON, HUMBERTO

JOBSON, ALEJANDRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZIMMERLY, CAROL

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

12/11/2018: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ANSWER BY HUMBERTO JOBSON

1/31/2017: ANSWER BY HUMBERTO JOBSON

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

1/24/2017: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED HUMBERTO JOBSON DATE SERVED: 1/7/17

1/18/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED HUMBERTO JOBSON DATE SERVED: 1/7/17

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017002951

1/9/2017: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017002951

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

1/6/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/6/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/5/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/5/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2017015070

2/10/2017: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2017015070

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/3/17

2/9/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/3/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

1/31/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT ONE FOR POSSESSION

1/24/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT AS TO COUNT ONE FOR POSSESSION

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

1/24/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/20/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED ALEJANDRA JOBSON DATE SERVED: 1/7/17

1/18/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED ALEJANDRA JOBSON DATE SERVED: 1/7/17

DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

1/5/2017: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/5/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • DocketEntry: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: DEFAULT JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION (COUNT ONE) (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2017
  • DocketEntry: ORDER ON MOTION TO REMOVE NAME FROM EVICTION (DENIED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • DocketEntry: MOTION TO REMOVE NAME FROM EVICTION (FTJ)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2017015070

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, POSTED 2/3/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, POSTED ALEJANDRA JOBSON DATE SERVED: 1/7/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017002951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/06/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000031 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 2 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZIMMERLY, CAROL