Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 02/29/2020 at 03:20:06 (UTC).

2295 EAST IRLO HOLDINGS LLC vs. DONAT, LINDSAY

Case Summary

On 02/14/2020 2295 EAST IRLO HOLDINGS LLC filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against DONAT, LINDSAY. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************0 EV

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2295 EAST IRLO HOLDINGS LLC

Defendants

DONAT, LINDSAY

DIXON, MAGALY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KING, KYLE P

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/19/20 12:53 PARTY SERVED: MAGALY DIXON/MOTHER

2/28/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/19/20 12:53 PARTY SERVED: MAGALY DIXON/MOTHER

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 02/19/2020 PARTY SERVED: MAGALY DIXON

2/28/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 02/19/2020 PARTY SERVED: MAGALY DIXON

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT AND TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT AND FINAL HEARING FOR POSSESSION

2/25/2020: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT AND TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT AND FINAL HEARING FOR POSSESSION

NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

2/24/2020: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANTS

2/24/2020: ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANTS

PAYMENT RECEIPT (SUMMONS)

2/20/2020: PAYMENT RECEIPT (SUMMONS)

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MAGALY DIXON

2/19/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MAGALY DIXON

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR LINDSAY DONAT

2/19/2020: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR LINDSAY DONAT

PAYMENT $6.00 RECEIPT #2020017670

2/19/2020: PAYMENT $6.00 RECEIPT #2020017670

COMPLAINT (7 DAY)/POSSESSION FROM HOLDOVER TENANT

2/14/2020: COMPLAINT (7 DAY)/POSSESSION FROM HOLDOVER TENANT

SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO THE ATTORNEY ON RECORD

2/14/2020: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO THE ATTORNEY ON RECORD

PAYMENT $224.00 RECEIPT #2020016492

2/14/2020: PAYMENT $224.00 RECEIPT #2020016492

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

2/14/2020: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

2/14/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2020
  • HearingEvent: MOTION FOR DEFAULT; Judge: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE; Location: COURTROOM 4B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 2/19/20 12:53 PARTY SERVED: MAGALY DIXON/MOTHER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 02/19/2020 PARTY SERVED: MAGALY DIXON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT SET FOR 03/03/2020 AT 10:00 AM IN 4B BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NOTICE OF HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTIONS FOR DEFAULT AND TO RELEASE FUNDS ON DEPOSIT AND FINAL HEARING FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: ANSWER FROM THE DEFENDANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT RECEIPT (SUMMONS)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR MAGALY DIXON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FOR LINDSAY DONAT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $6.00 RECEIPT #2020017670

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT (7 DAY)/POSSESSION FROM HOLDOVER TENANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (GIVEN TO THE ATTORNEY ON RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $224.00 RECEIPT #2020016492

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2020
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 02/14/2020 CASE NUMBER 2020 CC 000480 EV

    Read MoreRead Less