Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Osceola County Courts on 12/14/2020 at 14:34:57 (UTC).

2014 2 IH BORROWER LP vs. RAMIREZ, EDGAR

Case Summary

On 01/05/2017 2014 2 IH BORROWER LP filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against RAMIREZ, EDGAR. This case was filed in Osceola County Courts, Osceola County Courthouse located in Osceola, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is EPPERSON, HAL C JR. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *************2 EV

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    Osceola County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Osceola County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Osceola, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

EPPERSON, HAL C JR

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2014 2 IH BORROWER LP

Defendants

VELAZQUEZ, EDNA

RAMIREZ, EDGAR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL G

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, UNSERVED (CXL)

2/14/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, UNSERVED (CXL)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

2/3/2017: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/10/17 PARTY SERVED: EDGAR RAMIREZ

1/18/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/10/17 PARTY SERVED: EDGAR RAMIREZ

SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/10/17 PARTY SERVED: EDNA VELAZAUEZ

1/18/2017: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/10/17 PARTY SERVED: EDNA VELAZAUEZ

PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICTION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

1/18/2017: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICTION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

1/18/2017: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

1/18/2017: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

1/10/2017: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017002237

1/6/2017: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017002237

DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

1/5/2017: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

1/5/2017: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/5/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1/5/2017: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

1/5/2017: CIVIL COVER SHEET

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION - POSSESSION ONLY (REC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION, RETURNED, UNSERVED (CXL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE CLOSED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED (OCSO)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • DocketEntry: FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION POSSESSION ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 1/10/17 PARTY SERVED: EDGAR RAMIREZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 1/10/17 PARTY SERVED: EDNA VELAZAUEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S VERIFICTION OF CLAIM AND NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: MOTION FOR DEFAULT (5 DAY) AND DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: PAYMENT $205.00 RECEIPT #2017002237

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: DELIVERY / READ EMAIL CONFIRMATION TO ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEntry: CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION ( 3 DAY/ CT 1 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2017
  • DocketEntry: CASE FILED 01/05/2017 CASE NUMBER 2017 CC 000022 EV

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer DAVIS, MICHAEL G